Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Benjamin Ndiaye

Archbishop of Dakar, Senegal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1948 Born
21 Aug 197728.8Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jun 200152.6AppointedBishop of Kaolack, Senegal
24 Nov 200153.0Ordained BishopBishop of Kaolack, Senegal
22 Dec 201466.1AppointedArchbishop of Dakar, Senegal
21 Feb 201566.3InstalledArchbishop of Dakar, Senegal

MicroData Summary for Benjamin Ndiaye
Archbishop Benjamin Ndiaye (born ) Archbishop of Dakar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFadiouth

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Dakar.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,076
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2014
  • i: CB, 26 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast