Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bertram Johannes Meier

Bishop of Augsburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1960 Born
10 Oct 198525.2Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
8 Jul 201958.9AppointedAdministrator of Augsburg, Germany
29 Jan 202059.5AppointedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
25 Mar 202059.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Augsburg, Germany
6 Jun 202059.8Ordained BishopBishop of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Bertram Johannes Meier
Bishop Bertram Johannes Meier (born ) Bishop of Augsburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuchloe, Diocese of Augsburg
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Augsburg, Diocese of Augsburg

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Augsburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Jan 2020
  • admi: AM, 29 Jan 2020
  • c23: CB, 31 Jan 2020
  • c4: CB, 4 Mar 2020
  • mn: CB, 1 Apr 2020
  • ob: CB, 6 May 2020
  • aadm: AM, 25 May 2020
  • c34: CB, 2 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 7 Jun 2020

Quantcast