Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adalbert Ndzana

Bishop Emeritus of Mbalmayo, Cameroon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1939 Born
15 Aug 196930.0Ordained PriestPriest
8 Nov 198445.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Mbalmayo, Cameroon
20 Jan 198545.5Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Mbalmayo, Cameroon
7 Mar 198747.6SucceededBishop of Mbalmayo, Cameroon
27 Dec 201677.4RetiredBishop of Mbalmayo, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Adalbert Ndzana
Bishop Adalbert Ndzana (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Mbalmayo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZoatoubsi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mbalmayo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jan 2017