Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Kornelius Sipayung, O.F.M. Cap.

Archbishop of Medan, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1970 Born
22 Aug 199827.9Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
11 Dec 199929.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
8 Dec 201848.2AppointedArchbishop of Medan, Indonesia
2 Feb 201948.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Medan, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Kornelius Sipayung
Archbishop Kornelius Sipayung O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Archbishop of Medan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBandar Hinalang-Kabanjahe, Archdiocese of Medan
Ordained BishopGedung Serba Guna Pemprovsu, Medan, Archdiocese of Medan

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Medan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Dec 2018
  • ob: CB, 18 Dec 2018
  • c2: CB, 27 Dec 2018
  • c34: CB, 2 Feb 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,095

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 11 Jun 2019

Quantcast