Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martinus Dogma Situmorang, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Padang, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1946Born
5 Jan 197427.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
17 Mar 198336.9AppointedBishop of Padang, Indonesia
11 Jun 198337.2Ordained BishopBishop of Padang, Indonesia
19 Nov 201973.6DiedBishop of Padang, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Martinus Dogma Situmorang (VIAF: 107980334)
Bishop Martinus Dogma Situmorang O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Padang

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalipi
Death PlaceSanto Borromeus, Hospital, Bandung

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 19 Nov 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 19 Nov 2019

Quantcast