Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vitus Rubianto Solichin, S.X.

Bishop of Padang, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1968 Born
18 Mar 199627.3Solemn VowsMember of Xaverian Missionary Fathers
7 Jul 199728.6Ordained PriestPriest of Xaverian Missionary Fathers
3 Jul 202152.6AppointedBishop of Padang, Indonesia
7 Oct 202152.8Ordained BishopBishop of Padang, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Vitus Rubianto Solichin
Bishop Vitus Rubianto Solichin S.X. (born ) Bishop of Padang

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSemarang, Archdiocese of Semarang
Ordained BishopCathedral, Padang, Diocese of Padang

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Padang.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2021
  • ob/c1: CB, 17 Jul 2021
  • ob: CB, 16 Aug 2021
  • c2+: AM, 2 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 7 Oct 2021

Quantcast