Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adrianus Sunarko, O.F.M.

Bishop of Pangkal-Pinang, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1966 Born
15 Aug 199427.6Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
8 Jul 199528.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
28 Jun 201750.5AppointedBishop of Pangkal-Pinang, Indonesia
23 Sep 201750.7Ordained BishopBishop of Pangkal-Pinang, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Adrianus Sunarko
Bishop Adrianus Sunarko O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Pangkal-Pinang

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMerauke, Archdiocese of Merauke
Ordained BishopStadion Depati Amir, Pangkalpinang, Diocese of Pangkal-Pinang

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pangkal-Pinang.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2017
  • ob: CB, 1 Jul 2017
  • c23: CB, 7 Sep 2017
  • c34: CB, 22 Sep 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,584

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast