Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Tanjungkarang

Dioecesis Tangiungkaranganus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Yohanes Harun Yuwono, Bishop
  • Andreas Henrisusanta, S.C.I., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 22 August 1973
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Palembang
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Indonesia
  • Square Kilometers: 36,000 (13,905 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.keuskupantanjungkarang.org/
  • Mailing Address: Pastoran Katolik, Jl. Way Lubuk 4, P.O. Box 93, 35127 Bandar Lampung, Sumatra, Indonesia
  • Telephone: (0721)252.531
  • Fax: 260.358

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Tandjung-Karang
19 June 1952ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Tandjung-Karang (erected)
Diocese of Tandjung-Karang
3 January 1961ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Tandjung-Karang Diocese of Tandjung-Karang
Diocese of Tanjungkarang
22 August 1973Name ChangedDiocese of Tandjung-Karang Diocese of Tanjungkarang
1 July 2003Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Tanjungkarang (from Medan)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Tandjung-Karang
196930,0312,350,0001.3%119201,50122809ap1971
Diocese of Tanjungkarang
198060,2853,525,0001.7%128292,0786211811ap1981
199077,2806,140,0001.3%218203,8643410011ap1991
199888,3728,351,0001.1%2214362,4543218518ap2001
200182,6958,658,7001.0%2415392,1203420620ap2002
200288,8966,894,4371.3%2414382,3393121519ap2003
200390,2616,894,4371.3%2615412,2012822420ap2004
200493,5186,908,4371.4%2518432,1742223020ap2005
201075,7897,269,0001.0%3120511,4867519421ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 10 Oct 2013