Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Yohanes Harun Yuwono

Archbishop of Palembang, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1964 Born
8 Dec 199228.4Ordained PriestPriest of Pangkal-Pinang, Indonesia
19 Jul 201349.0AppointedBishop of Tanjungkarang, Indonesia
10 Oct 201349.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tanjungkarang, Indonesia
3 Jul 202156.9AppointedArchbishop of Palembang, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Yohanes Harun Yuwono
Archbishop Yohanes Harun Yuwono (born ) Archbishop of Palembang

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWay Ray – Padang Dermin, Diocese of Tandjung-Karang
Ordained BishopXavier High School Pahoman, Bandar Lampung

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Palembang.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Jul 2013
  • ob: CB, 24 Jul 2013
  • c23: CB, 1 Sep 2013
  • c4: CB, 9 Oct 2013
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2,013, Number 142
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,975
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Jul 2021

Quantcast