Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fransiskus Tuaman Sasfo Sinaga

Bishop of Sibolga, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1972 Born
14 Feb 200330.2Ordained PriestPriest of Sibolga, Indonesia
6 Mar 202148.2AppointedBishop of Sibolga, Indonesia
29 Jul 202148.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sibolga, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Fransiskus Tuaman Sasfo Sinaga
Bishop Fransiskus Tuaman Sasfo Sinaga (born ) Bishop of Sibolga

EventPlace
Birth PlacePenggalangan, Archdiocese of Medan
Ordained BishopSanta Teresa di Lisieux, Cathedral, Sibolga, Diocese of Sibolga

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sibolga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Mar 2021
  • ob/c2: CB, 20 Mar 2021
  • ob: CB, 1 May 2021
  • ~ob: CB, 12 Jun 2021
  • ob: AM, 16 Jul 2021
  • c34: CB, 28 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Jul 2021

Quantcast