Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ignatius Cardinal Suharyo Hardjoatmodjo

Archbishop of Jakarta, Indonesia

Cardinal-Priest of Spirito Santo alla Ferratella

Bishop of Indonesia, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1950 Born
26 Jan 197625.5Ordained PriestPriest of Semarang, Indonesia
21 Apr 199746.7AppointedArchbishop of Semarang, Indonesia
22 Aug 199747.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Semarang, Indonesia
2 Jan 200655.4AppointedBishop of Indonesia, Military
25 Jul 200959.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Jakarta, Indonesia
28 Jun 201059.9SucceededArchbishop of Jakarta, Indonesia
5 Oct 201969.2Elevated to Cardinal
5 Oct 201969.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Spirito Santo alla Ferratella

MicroData Summary for Ignatius Suharyo Hardjoatmodjo (VIAF: 58209639)
Ignatius Cardinal Suharyo Hardjoatmodjo (born ) Archbishop of Jakarta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSedayu, Vicariate Apostolic of Semarang
Ordained PriestMajor Seminary, Chapel, Yogyakarta, Archdiocese of Semarang
Ordained BishopStade Jatidiri, Semarang, Archdiocese of Semarang

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Jakarta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Jan 2006
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Jul 2009
  • s: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,036
  • card: Bollettino, 1 Sep 2019
  • cpri: Bollettino, 5 Oct 2019
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 8 Oct 2019

Quantcast