Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincentius Sutikno Wisaksono

Bishop of Surabaya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1953 BornSurabaya
21 Jan 198228.3Ordained PriestPriest of Surabaya, Indonesia
3 Apr 200753.5AppointedBishop of Surabaya, Indonesia
29 Jun 200753.8Ordained BishopBishop of Surabaya, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Vincentius Sutikno Wisaksono:
Bishop Vincentius Sutikno Wisaksono (born ) Bishop of Surabaya

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Surabaya.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Apr 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,438

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013