Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Herman Joseph Sahadat Pandoyoputro, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Malang


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1939BornKopeng
2 Aug 197031.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
15 May 198950.0AppointedBishop of Malang, Indonesia
3 Sep 198950.3Ordained BishopBishop of Malang, Indonesia
28 Jun 201677.1RetiredBishop of Malang, Indonesia
23 Sep 201677.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Malang, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Herman Joseph Sahadat Pandoyoputro
Bishop Herman Joseph Sahadat Pandoyoputro O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Malang

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,277
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 23 Sep 2016