Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Sudiarna Hadiwikarta

Deceased

Bishop of Surabaya, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1944Born
8 Dec 197026.6Ordained PriestPriest
26 Mar 199449.9AppointedBishop of Surabaya, Indonesia
25 Jul 199450.3Ordained BishopBishop of Surabaya, Indonesia
13 Dec 200359.7DiedBishop of Surabaya, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Johannes Sudiarna Hadiwikarta
Bishop Johannes Sudiarna Hadiwikarta (born , died ) Bishop of Surabaya

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWonosobo

  • a priest for 33.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,430
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast