Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aloysius Josef G. Dibjokarjono

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Surabaya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1917BornWlingi Bilitar
2 Jun 194527.4Ordained PriestPriest of Surabaia, Indonesia
2 Apr 198264.2AppointedBishop of Surabaya, Indonesia
16 Dec 198264.9Ordained BishopBishop of Surabaya, Indonesia
26 Mar 199476.2RetiredBishop of Surabaya, Indonesia
23 Jan 200284.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Surabaya, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Aloysius Josef G. Dibjokarjono:
Bishop Aloysius Josef G. Dibjokarjono (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Surabaya

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015