Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Purwokerto

Dioecesis Purvokertensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Julianus Kemo Sunarko, S.J., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 3 January 1961
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Semarang
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Indonesia
  • Square Kilometers: 15,336 (5,923 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://keuskupan-purwokerto.net/
  • Mailing Address: Keuskupan, Jl. Gereja 3, Purwokerto 53115, Jawa-Tengah, Indonesia
  • Telephone: (0281)635.632
  • Fax: 631.611

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Purwokerto
25 April 1932ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Batavia Prefecture Apostolic of Purwokerto (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Purwokerto
16 October 1941ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Purwokerto Vicariate Apostolic of Purwokerto
Diocese of Purwokerto
3 January 1961ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Purwokerto Diocese of Purwokerto

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Purwokerto
19503,7186,000,000.1%11112309185614ap1951
Diocese of Purwokerto
197022,7439,126,388.2%2222494761139ap1971
198035,59911,169,635.3%420241,48363160ap1981
199058,84614,024,086.4%523282,10194196ap1991
199970,66816,996,921.4%1126371,9099319216ap2000
200071,83517,166,852.4%1025352,0529119516ap2001
200173,98417,448,652.4%1324371,9999219516ap2002
200274,36417,623,145.4%1429431,7299319618ap2003
200375,91217,705,379.4%1632481,5816919121ap2004
200476,74417,698,013.4%3129601,2796319821ap2005
201073,72818,430,000.4%3138691,06827321924ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.9, 28 May 2012; data: 22 Jul 2012