Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christophorus Tri Harsono

Bishop of Purwokerto, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1966 Born
5 Feb 199529.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bogor, Indonesia
14 Jul 201852.4AppointedBishop of Purwokerto, Indonesia
16 Oct 201852.7Ordained BishopBishop of Purwokerto, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Christophorus Tri Harsono
Bishop Christophorus Tri Harsono (born ) Bishop of Purwokerto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBogor, Diocese of Bogor
Ordained BishopGraha Widyatama Unsoed, Purwokerto, Diocese of Purwokerto

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Purwokerto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jul 2018
  • ob: CB, 20 Jul 2018
  • c2: CB, 8 Aug 2018
  • c34: CB, 2 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 16 Oct 2018

Quantcast