Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Willem Schoemaker, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Purwokerto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1909BornDeventer, Netherlands
10 Aug 193324.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
31 May 195041.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Purwokerto, Indonesia
31 May 195041.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Balbura
18 Oct 195041.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Balbura
3 Jan 196151.9AppointedBishop of Purwokerto, Indonesia
17 Dec 197364.9ResignedBishop of Purwokerto, Indonesia
3 Jan 198373.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Purwokerto, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Willem Schoemaker:
Bishop Willem Schoemaker M.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Purwokerto

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 88

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015