Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benyamin Yosef Bria

Deceased

Bishop of Denpasar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1956BornOekabiti
29 Jun 198528.9Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 200043.7AppointedBishop of Denpasar, Indonesia
6 Aug 200044.0Ordained BishopBishop of Denpasar, Indonesia
18 Sep 200751.1DiedBishop of Denpasar, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Benyamin Yosef Bria:
Bishop Benyamin Yosef Bria (born , died ) Bishop of Denpasar

  • a priest for 22.2 years
  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,814
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013