Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Pessers, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Atambua

Titular Bishop of Candyba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1896BornTilburg
10 Jun 192226.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
1 Jun 193741.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Timor Olandese, Indonesia
1 Jun 193741.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Candyba
28 Oct 193741.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Candyba
11 Nov 194852.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Atambua, Indonesia
14 Nov 195761.8ResignedVicar Apostolic of Atambua, Indonesia
3 Apr 196165.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Atambua, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Jacques Pessers:
Bishop Jacques Pessers S.V.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Atambua

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013