Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoon van Oorschoot, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mbeya, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1899Born
16 Jul 192324.4Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
17 Oct 194748.7AppointedPrefect of Tukuyu, Tanzania
14 Jul 194950.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mbeya, Tanzania
14 Jul 194950.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Cenae
30 Oct 194950.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cenae
25 Mar 195354.1AppointedBishop of Mbeya, Tanzania
10 Dec 196465.8DiedBishop of Mbeya, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Antoon van Oorschoot
Bishop Antoon van Oorschoot M. Afr. (born , died ) Bishop of Mbeya

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHeeswijk, Netherlands

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 100

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018