Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johannes Zwijsen (Zwysen)

Deceased

Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1794BornTilburg
19 Jan 181722.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Dec 181723.3Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jan 184247.4AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
14 Jan 184247.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Geras
17 Apr 184247.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Geras
13 Oct 185157.1SucceededVicar Apostolic of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
4 Mar 185358.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
4 Mar 185358.5AppointedArchbishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
4 Feb 186873.4AppointedBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
4 Feb 186873.4ResignedArchbishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
16 Oct 187783.1DiedBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Johannes Zwijsen (Zwysen):
Archbishop Johannes Zwijsen (Zwysen) (born , died ) Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 165, and Page 574
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 122, and Page 203

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013