Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonius van Dyck

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Breda

Titular Bishop of Adrana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1791¹BornUlvenhould
11 Dec 184655.9AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Breda, Netherlands
11 Dec 184655.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Adrana
16 May 184756.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adrana
13 Jul 184857.5DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Breda, Netherlands

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonius van Dyck
Bishop Antonius van Dyck (born 1791, died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Breda

  • a bishop for 1.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 76
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1847, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 Dec 2016