Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Petrus Maria Vrancken

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Batavia, Indonesia

Titular Archbishop of Attalea in Pamphylia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1806Born
13 Jun 182922.5Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jun 184740.5AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Batavia, Indonesia
4 Jun 184740.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Colophon
15 Aug 184740.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Colophon
19 Apr 185245.4SucceededVicar Apostolic of Batavia, Indonesia
28 May 187467.5RetiredVicar Apostolic of Batavia, Indonesia
16 Jun 187467.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Attalea in Pamphylia
17 Aug 187972.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Batavia, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Petrus Maria Vrancken (VIAF: 290532989)
Archbishop Petrus Maria Vrancken (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Batavia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontenaeken, Netherlands

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 129, and Page 216
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1847, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Mar 2017