Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes van Hooydonk

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Breda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1782BornGinneken
7 Jan 182744.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Breda, Netherlands
14 Jan 184259.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Dardanus
1 May 184259.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dardanus
4 Mar 185370.6AppointedBishop of Breda, Netherlands
Oct 1867³85.2ResignedBishop of Breda, Netherlands
25 Apr 186885.7DiedBishop of Breda, Netherlands

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johannes van Hooydonk:
Bishop Johannes van Hooydonk (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Breda

  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 156
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 173

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013