Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martinus Johannes Niewindt

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Curaçao, Netherlands Antilles

Titular Bishop of Chytri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1796BornAmsterdam, Netherlands
1823¹26.6AppointedPrefect of Curaçao, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles
20 Sep 184246.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Curaçao, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles
20 Sep 184246.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Chytri
24 Aug 184347.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chytri
12 Jan 186063.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Curaçao, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martinus Johannes Niewindt (VIAF: 54971558)
Bishop Martinus Johannes Niewindt (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Curaçao

  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 151
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Nov 2016