Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacobus Gerardus Schepers, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Dutch Guyana-Suriname, Suriname

Titular Bishop of Milopotamos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1798BornDingden, Netherlands
20 Apr 182930.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
20 Sep 184345.0AppointedAdministrator of Dutch Guyana-Suriname, Suriname, Antilles
7 Sep 185254.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Dutch Guyana-Suriname, Suriname, Antilles
7 Sep 185254.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Milopotamos
7 Sep 185355.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Milopotamos
27 Nov 186365.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Dutch Guyana-Suriname, Suriname, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Jacobus Gerardus Schepers
Bishop Jacobus Gerardus Schepers C.SS.R. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Dutch Guyana-Suriname

  • a priest for 34.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 378
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1853, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 27 Dec 2016