Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacobus Grooff

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Batavia

Titular Bishop of Canea

Vicar Apostolic of Dutch Guyana-Suriname, Suriname


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1800BornAmsterdam, Netherlands
19 Aug 182525.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Oct 182626.2AppointedPrefect of Dutch Guyana-Suriname, Suriname, Antilles
20 Sep 184242.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Batavia, Indonesia
20 Sep 184242.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Canea
26 Feb 184443.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Canea
1 Dec 184646.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Dutch Guyana-Suriname, Suriname, Antilles
19 Apr 185251.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Batavia, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Jacobus Grooff:
Bishop Jacobus Grooff (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Batavia

  • a priest for 26.7 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 62
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Pio IX (Gams), Page 24, and Page 99

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013