Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Willem Pieter Adriaan Maria Mutsaerts

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)

Titular Archbishop of Phulli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1889BornTilburg
6 Jun 191425.0Ordained PriestPriest
2 May 194252.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
2 May 194252.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Lyrbe
29 Jun 194253.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lyrbe
18 Mar 194353.8SucceededBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
27 Jun 196071.0ResignedBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
27 Jun 196071.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Phulli
16 Aug 196475.2DiedBishop Emeritus of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Willem Pieter Adriaan Maria Mutsaerts:
Archbishop Willem Pieter Adriaan Maria Mutsaerts (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013