Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerard Marie Franciscus van Velsen, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kroonstad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1910BornZwolle, Netherlands
25 Jul 193525.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
31 May 195039.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kroonstad, South Africa
31 May 195039.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tremithus
25 Jul 195040.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tremithus
11 Jan 195140.4AppointedBishop of Kroonstad, South Africa
15 Nov 197565.3ResignedBishop of Kroonstad, South Africa
3 Mar 199685.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Kroonstad, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Gerard Marie Franciscus van Velsen:
Bishop Gerard Marie Franciscus van Velsen O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kroonstad

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 45.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013