Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Ludgerus Bonaventure Brenninkmeijer, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Kroonstad, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1930Born
25 Jul 195727.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
15 Apr 197746.7AppointedBishop of Kroonstad, South Africa
24 Jul 197747.0Ordained BishopBishop of Kroonstad, South Africa
2 Jul 200372.9DiedBishop of Kroonstad, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Johannes Ludgerus Bonaventure Brenninkmeijer
Bishop Johannes Ludgerus Bonaventure Brenninkmeijer O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Kroonstad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmsterdam, Diocese of Haarlem, Netherlands
Ordained BishopWelkom
Death PlaceKroonstad, Diocese of Kroonstad

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 43, Number 2,876

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 Jul 2021

Quantcast