Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hubert Bücher

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bethlehem, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1931Born
29 Jun 195726.0Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
9 Dec 197645.4AppointedBishop of Bethlehem, South Africa
27 Mar 197745.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bethlehem, South Africa
31 Dec 200877.5RetiredBishop of Bethlehem, South Africa
23 Jul 202190.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Bethlehem, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Hubert Bücher
Bishop Hubert Bücher (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bethlehem

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRegensburg, Diocese of Regensburg, Germany
Ordained BishopBethlehem, Diocese of Bethlehem
Death PlaceSchönhofen, Nittendorf, Diocese of Regensburg, Germany
Buried Place (Original)St. Peter, Cathedral, Regensburg, Diocese of Regensburg, Germany

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 44.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Dec 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 41, Number 2,659
  • d: CB, 24 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Jul 2021

Quantcast