Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan de Groef, M. Afr.

Bishop of Bethlehem, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1948 Born
19 Jan 197931.0ProfessedMember of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
7 Jul 197931.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
31 Dec 200860.9AppointedBishop of Bethlehem, South Africa
28 Mar 200961.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bethlehem, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Jan de Groef
Bishop Jan de Groef M. Afr. (born ) Bishop of Bethlehem

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeigem, Belgium

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bethlehem.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Dec 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,083

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast