Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Maseru

Archidioecesis Maseruenus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Gerard Tlali Lerotholi, O.M.I., Archbishop
  • Bernard Mohlalisi, O.M.I., Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 3 January 1961
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Lesotho
  • Square Kilometers: 7,739 (2,989 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 267, 19 Orpen Rd., Maseru 100, Lesotho
  • Telephone: 31.25.65
  • Fax: 31.04.25

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Basutoland
8 May 1894ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Kimberley in Orange Prefecture Apostolic of Basutoland (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Basutoland
18 February 1909ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Basutoland Vicariate Apostolic of Basutoland
Diocese of Maseru
11 January 1951ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Basutoland Diocese of Maseru
11 December 1952Territory LostDiocese of Maseru Diocese of Leribe (erected)
3 January 1961Territory LostDiocese of Maseru Diocese of Qacha’s Nek (erected)
Archdiocese of Maseru
3 January 1961ElevatedDiocese of Maseru Archdiocese of Maseru
10 November 1977Territory LostArchdiocese of Maseru Diocese of Mohale’s Hoek (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Basutoland
1950190,650560,55034.0%41181221,5629744044ap1951
Diocese of Maseru
Archdiocese of Maseru
1969228,417547,33241.7%61001062,15418740041ap1971
1980223,000402,00055.5%656623,59611430730ap1981
1990264,452464,69656.9%1179902,93810928331ap1991
1999265,034464,86257.0%2541664,0159526533ap2000
2000245,402469,51052.3%2746733,3619725435ap2001
2001246,629471,85752.3%3243753,2889828835ap2002
2002246,752472,09252.3%3146773,2049628341ap2003
2003246,875472,32852.3%3149803,08510527841ap2004
2004246,998472,56452.3%3052823,01211527541ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 23 Jun 2013