Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jules-Joseph Cénez, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Basutoland

Titular Bishop of Nicopolis in Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1865BornHampont, France
8 Sep 189025.3Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
1897¹31.6AppointedPrefect of Basutoland, Lesotho
27 Feb 190943.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Basutoland, Lesotho
27 Feb 190943.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicopolis in Armenia
1 May 190944.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicopolis in Armenia
24 May 193065.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Basutoland, Lesotho
2 Mar 194478.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Basutoland, Lesotho

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jules-Joseph Cénez:
Bishop Jules-Joseph Cénez O.M.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Basutoland

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 16
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 272

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013