Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gabriel Joseph Élie Breynat, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mackenzie, Northwest Territories

Titular Archbishop of Garella


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1867BornSaint-Vallier-sur-Rhône, France
24 May 188921.6ProfessedMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
21 Feb 189224.3Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
31 Jul 190133.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mackenzie, Northwest Territories, Canada
31 Jul 190133.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
6 Apr 190234.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
11 Dec 193972.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Garella
6 Apr 194375.5RetiredVicar Apostolic of Mackenzie, Northwest Territories, Canada
10 Mar 195486.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mackenzie, Northwest Territories, Canada

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Joseph Élie Breynat
Archbishop Gabriel Joseph Élie Breynat O.M.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mackenzie

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 51.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 76
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 37
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 18
  • op/c1: CB, 11 Feb 2016
  • prof: CB, 12 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016