Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Freri

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1864Born
17 Dec 188723.8Ordained PriestPriest
9 Apr 192460.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia
28 Oct 192460.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia
30 Oct 192763.6DiedTitular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia

MicroData Summary for Joseph Freri
Bishop Joseph Freri (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Etienne, France

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1928
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017