Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Joseph-Alfred Cardinal Foulon

Deceased

Archbishop of Lyon (-Vienne)

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1823BornParis
18 Dec 184724.6Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
19 Jan 186743.7SelectedBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
27 Mar 186743.9ConfirmedBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
1 May 186744.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
22 Mar 188258.9SelectedArchbishop of Besançon, France
30 Mar 188258.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Besançon, France
2 May 188764.0SelectedArchbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
26 May 188764.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
24 May 188966.1Elevated to Cardinal
30 Dec 188966.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
23 Jan 189369.7DiedArchbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Alfred Foulon:
Cardinal Joseph-Alfred Foulon (born , died ) Archbishop of Lyon (-Vienne)

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
  • a cardinal for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 150, and Page 354
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 401, and Page 48
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 May 1889

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013