Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François-Albert Leuillieux

Deceased

Archbishop of Chambéry


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1823BornSaint-Omer
23 Dec 184825.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 187249.0SelectedBishop of Carcassonne, France
21 Mar 187349.3ConfirmedBishop of Carcassonne, France
11 Jun 187349.5Ordained BishopBishop of Carcassonne, France
13 Jan 188157.1SelectedArchbishop of Chambéry, France
13 May 188157.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Chambéry, France
11 May 189369.4DiedArchbishop of Chambéry, France

MicroData Summary for François-Albert Leuillieux:
Archbishop François-Albert Leuillieux (born , died ) Archbishop of Chambéry

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 181, and Page 198

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013