Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfonso Maria Giordano, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Calvi e Teano

Titular Archbishop of Proconnesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1835BornMontefredane
16 May 185217.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
20 Mar 185823.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
6 May 188146.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy
6 May 188146.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Dometiopolis
15 May 188146.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dometiopolis
20 Jun 188247.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy
20 Oct 188449.6SucceededBishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy
16 Dec 190772.7ResignedBishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy
16 Dec 190772.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Proconnesus
10 Feb 190872.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Calvi e Teano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Maria Giordano:
Archbishop Alfonso Maria Giordano C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Calvi e Teano

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 174, and Page 249
  • bp/bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013