Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles-Amable de la Tour d’Auvergne Lauraguais

Deceased

Archbishop of Bourges


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1826BornMoulins
12 Aug 184922.7Ordained PriestPriest
17 Nov 185629.9AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
6 Apr 186134.3SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Bourges, France
22 Jul 186134.6ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Bourges, France
22 Jul 186134.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Colossae {Rhodes}
1 Aug 186134.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Colossae {Rhodes}
10 Dec 186135.0SucceededArchbishop of Bourges, France
17 Sep 187952.8DiedArchbishop of Bourges, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Amable de la Tour d’Auvergne Lauraguais:
Archbishop Charles-Amable de la Tour d’Auvergne Lauraguais (born , died ) Archbishop of Bourges

  • a priest for 30.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 150, and Page 216

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013