Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre-Paul Servonnet

Deceased

Archbishop of Bourges, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1830Born
16 Jul 185423.5Ordained PriestPriest
24 Apr 188958.3SelectedBishop of Digne, France
27 May 188958.4ConfirmedBishop of Digne, France
25 Jul 188958.6Ordained BishopBishop of Digne, France
8 Aug 188958.6InstalledBishop of Digne, France
15 Apr 189766.3SelectedArchbishop of Bourges, France
19 Apr 189766.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Bourges, France
3 Aug 189766.6InstalledArchbishop of Bourges, France
18 Oct 190978.8DiedArchbishop of Bourges, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Paul Servonnet (VIAF: 219697864)
Archbishop Pierre-Paul Servonnet (born , died ) Archbishop of Bourges

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Pierre-de-Bressieux
Ordained BishopSt. Jean, Lyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne)

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 150, and Page 245
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017