Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin-François Baslé, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mysore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1851BornLa Guerche, France
10 Oct 187524.3Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
15 Dec 190554.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Mysore, India
15 Dec 190554.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Calynda
1 May 190654.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Calynda
2 Jun 191058.9SucceededBishop of Mysore, India
13 Sep 191564.2DiedBishop of Mysore, India

MicroData Summary for Augustin-François Baslé:
Bishop Augustin-François Baslé M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Mysore

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 32
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013