Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Romain-Ernest Isoard

Deceased

Bishop of Annecy, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1820Born
17 Dec 185333.4Ordained PriestPriest
9 May 187958.8SelectedBishop of Annecy, France
15 May 187958.8ConfirmedBishop of Annecy, France
29 Jun 187958.9Ordained BishopBishop of Annecy, France
3 Aug 190181.0DiedBishop of Annecy, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Romain-Ernest Isoard (VIAF: 27109175)
Bishop Louis-Romain-Ernest Isoard (born , died ) Bishop of Annecy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Quentin
Ordained BishopInstitut catholique-rue Vaugirard, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 105
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Mar 2017