Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Félix-Joseph-François-Barthélemy de Las Cases

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1809Born
14 Jul 186151.8Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jan 186757.3SelectedBishop of Constantine, Algeria
27 Mar 186757.5ConfirmedBishop of Constantine, Algeria
5 May 186757.6Ordained BishopBishop of Constantine, Algeria
29 Aug 187060.9ResignedBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
1 Oct 188071.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria

MicroData Summary for Félix-Joseph-François-Barthélemy de Las Cases (VIAF: 71448839)
Bishop Félix-Joseph-François-Barthélemy de Las Cases (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Constantine (-Hippone)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePoudis, France
Ordained BishopBenedictines-rue Monsieur, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 19.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 223
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1867, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Feb 2017