Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Baptiste-François-Anne-Thomas Landriot

Deceased

Archbishop of Reims, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1816Born
25 May 183923.3Ordained PriestPriest
3 May 185640.3SelectedBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
16 Jun 185640.4ConfirmedBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
20 Jul 185640.5Ordained BishopBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
16 Jan 186751.0SelectedArchbishop of Reims, France
27 Mar 186751.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Reims, France
8 Jun 187458.4DiedArchbishop of Reims, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-François-Anne-Thomas Landriot (VIAF: 76448048)
Archbishop Jean-Baptiste-François-Anne-Thomas Landriot (born , died ) Archbishop of Reims

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCouches-les-Mines
Ordained BishopS. Lazare, Cathedral, Autun, Diocese of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon)

  • a priest for 35.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 480, and Page 488
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 May 2017