Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Léon-Benoit-Charles Cardinal Thomas

Deceased

Archbishop of Rouen

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Nuova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1826BornParay-le Monial
21 Dec 185024.6Ordained PriestPriest of Autun, France
19 Jan 186740.6SelectedBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
27 Mar 186740.8ConfirmedBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
15 May 186741.0Ordained BishopBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
28 Nov 188357.5SelectedArchbishop of Rouen, France
24 Mar 188457.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Rouen, France
16 Jan 189366.6Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jun 189367.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Nuova
9 Mar 189467.8DiedArchbishop of Rouen, France

MicroData Summary for Léon-Benoit-Charles Thomas:
Cardinal Léon-Benoit-Charles Thomas (born , died ) Archbishop of Rouen

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
  • a cardinal for 1.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 486, and Page 488
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 50
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Jan 1893

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013