Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Paul Sagot du Vauroux

Deceased

Bishop of Agen, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1857Born
2 Oct 188124.5Ordained PriestPriest of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
21 Feb 190648.8AppointedBishop of Agen, France
25 Feb 190648.9Ordained BishopBishop of Agen, France
15 Aug 193780.3DiedBishop of Agen, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Paul Sagot du Vauroux
Bishop Charles-Paul Sagot du Vauroux (born , died ) Bishop of Agen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaintes

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • op: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 40
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017