Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Raymond Villard

Deceased

Bishop of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1854BornLangres
24 Sep 188127.0Ordained PriestPriest of Langres, France
13 Jul 190651.8AppointedBishop of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon), France
5 Aug 190651.8Ordained BishopBishop of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon), France
8 Dec 191460.2DiedBishop of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon), France

MicroData Summary for Henri-Raymond Villard:
Bishop Henri-Raymond Villard (born , died ) Bishop of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon)

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 38
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013