Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel-Marie-Joseph-Anthelme Martin de Gibergues

Deceased

Bishop of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1855BornParis
17 Jul 188126.0Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
7 Feb 191256.5AppointedBishop of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux), France
1 May 191256.7Ordained BishopBishop of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux), France
28 Dec 191964.4DiedBishop of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux), France

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel-Marie-Joseph-Anthelme Martin de Gibergues:
Bishop Emmanuel-Marie-Joseph-Anthelme Martin de Gibergues (born , died ) Bishop of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux)

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013